International Maths Olympiad Forum By SOF Olympiad Trainer

# User Forum

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 7

## Ans 1: (Master Answer)

Class : Class 1

Let Cost price be ‘x’.
Selling price = x – 15% of x = 85x /100
85x /100 = 1275
So, x(cost price) = 127500/85 = Rs. 1,500
So, new selling price = 1500 + 10% of 1500
= 1500 + 150 = Rs. 1650
Answer-(D) Rs 1650

## Post Your Answer

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 6

## Ans 1: (Master Answer)

Class : Class 1

(C): It is given that,
Area of rectangle = Area of square
⇒ l × b = side × side
Also, length of rectangle = perimeter of square ## Post Your Answer

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 5

## Ans 1:

Class : Class 5
Why no solution ??

## Ans 2: (Master Answer)

Class : Class 1

(D): The pattern followed is ## Post Your Answer

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 2

## Ans 1:

Class : Class 2
1 : 2 x 10 17 x 10 20 x 1 = 2102 : 12 x 10 7 x 10 5 x 1 = 1953 : 7 x 10 20 x 10 20 x 1 = 2903 > 1 > 2Close1 : 2 x 10 17 x 10 20 x 1 = 2102 : 12 x 10 7 x 10 5 x 1 = 1953 : 7 x 10 20 x 10 20 x 1 = 2903 > 1 > 2Close1 : 2 x 10 17 x 10 20 x 1 = 2102 : 12 x 10 7 x 10 5 x 1 = 1953 : 7 x 10 20 x 10 20 x 1 = 2903 > 1 > 2Close1 : 2 x 10 17 x 10 20 x 1 = 2102 : 12 x 10 7 x 10 5 x 1 = 1953 : 7 x 10 20 x 10 20 x 1 = 2903 > 1 > 2Close

## Ans 2: (Master Answer)

Class : Class 1

(C): 1 : 20 + 170 + 20 = 210
2 : 120 + 70 + 5  = 195
3 : 70 + 200 + 20  = 290
As, 290>210>195

So, 3 > 1 > 2

## Post Your Answer

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 5

## Ans 1: (Master Answer)

Class : Class 1

(D): Second multiple of 12 = 12 x 2 = 24
Third multiple of 8 = 8 x 3 = 24
Multiplying the second multiple of 12 by the third multiple of 8 = 24 x 24 = 576

## Post Your Answer

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 4

## Ans 1: (Master Answer)

Class : Class 1

(D):  A) XV - Fifteen
B) XIX - Nineteen
C) XXVI - Twenty six
D) IXIV is meaningless.

## Post Your Answer

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 6

## Ans 1: (Master Answer)

Class : Class 1

(A): So, Latika will be facing McD.

Class : Class 6

## Post Your Answer

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 2

Class : Class 2

Class : Class 2
yes answer is C

## Post Your Answer

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 5

## Ans 1: (Master Answer)

Class : Class 1

(B): Let’s assume the number be X.
32 thousands = 32,000
14 hundreds and 26 tens = 1400 + 260 = 1660
According to question,

32000 – X = 1660
Or, 32000 – 1660 = X
Or, X = 30340

## Post Your Answer

Subject :IMO    Class : Class 5

## Ans 1: (Master Answer)

Class : Class 1

(C): Sugar bags produced by W = Total sugar bags produced - Sugar bags produced by U - Sugar bags produced by V
= 53112709 - 24809565 - 18738576
= 9564568
Now, 24809565 > 18738576 > 9564568
Therefore, U produced more sugar bags.